EP4319185 - LINK STATUS MEASUREMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Yi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Ling Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Gang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22790727.6 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022CN79342 | Priority number, date | CN202110444046 | 23.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110444046 | [2024/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022222618 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4319185 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/272, H04B10/077, H04Q11/00 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
H04B10/0773 (EP);
H04Q11/0062 (CN);
H04B10/0795 (US);
H04B10/272 (EP);
H04Q11/0067 (EP);
H04Q2011/0081 (CN);
H04Q2011/0083 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | H04Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DES VERBINDUNGSSTATUS, SYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/06] | English: | LINK STATUS MEASUREMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESURE D'ÉTATS DE LIAISON, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2023 | Translation filed | 24.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101651495 (ZTE CORP); | [A]US2010183298 (BIEGERT MARK R [US], et al); | [A]US2015358076 (YANG YOUNG SEOK [KR], et al); | [A]CN107078793B |