EP4207080 - AVATAR GENERATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Zitiao Network Technology Co., Ltd. 0207, 2/F, Building 4 Zijin Digital Park Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYU, Weiwei Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Qiwei Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
BAI, Xu Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Lang Beijing 100190 / CN | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22790918.1 | 13.04.2022 | [2023/27] | WO2022CN86518 | Priority number, date | CN202110433895 | 20.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110433895 | [2023/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022222810 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207080 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T15/00, G06V10/774, G06V10/82, G06V40/16, G06N3/045, G06N3/047, G06N3/08, G06T13/40, G06T19/20, G06N3/0475 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G06T13/40 (EP);
G06T15/005 (CN);
G06T17/205 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/0475 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP,CN);
G06T15/506 (US);
G06T17/00 (EP);
G06T17/20 (CN);
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06V10/774 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP);
G06V40/171 (EP);
G06T2200/24 (US);
G06T2210/12 (US);
G06T2215/16 (EP);
G06T2219/2021 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | G06T17/00, G06T15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | AVATARERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE MEDIUM | [2023/27] | English: | AVATAR GENERATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND MEDIUM | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AVATAR, ET SUPPORT | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2023 | Translation filed | 29.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008309675 (FLEURY MICHEL [CA], et al); | [A]CN110348330 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA); | [XA]CN112541963 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN113112580 (BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECH CO LTD) |