EP4328482 - RING-TYPE LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOWA COMPANY, LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-8625 / JP | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Kentaro Soka-shi, Saitama 340-0004 / JP | 02 /
FUJIOKA, Takayuki Soka-shi, Saitama 340-0004 / JP | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22791386.0 | 08.03.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022JP09876 | Priority number, date | JP20210072918 | 22.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021072918 | [2024/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022224605 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4328482 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21S2/00, F21V31/00, F21Y115/10 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
F21V31/005 (EP,US);
F21V17/12 (US);
F21V17/16 (US);
F21Y2103/33 (EP);
F21Y2105/18 (US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | RINGFÖRMIGE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/09] | English: | RING-TYPE LIGHTING DEVICE | [2024/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE DU TYPE ANNEAU | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2023 | Translation filed | 17.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008071651 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2012124110 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [A]CN204534333U (BEIJING SENUO SUNSHINE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2019121497 |