EP4321824 - IN-COMPARTMENT AIR CONDITIONER, REFRIGERATION DEVICE, AND TRANSPORT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South 1-13-1, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEMIYA, Makoto Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Kouji Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 03 /
KAMEI, Noritaka Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22791397.7 | 11.03.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022JP10828 | Priority number, date | JP20210070968 | 20.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021070968 | [2024/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022224616 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321824 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F25D11/00, F25D23/00, B01D53/047, B01D53/26, B65D88/74 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
F25D29/003 (EP);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
A23B7/0425 (EP);
A23B7/148 (EP,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
B65D81/266 (US);
B65D85/505 (US);
B65D85/52 (US);
F25D17/042 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (US);
B01D2256/10 (EP);
B01D2257/102 (US);
B01D2257/104 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (US);
B01D2258/06 (US);
B01D2259/40003 (US);
B01D2259/40009 (US);
B01D2259/402 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | INNENRAUMKLIMAANLAGE, KÜHLVORRICHTUNG UND TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER | [2024/07] | English: | IN-COMPARTMENT AIR CONDITIONER, REFRIGERATION DEVICE, AND TRANSPORT CONTAINER | [2024/07] | French: | CLIMATISEUR INTÉGRÉ DANS UN COMPARTIMENT, DISPOSITIF DE RÉFRIGÉRATION ET CONTENEUR DE TRANSPORT | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2023 | Translation filed | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 23.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4142372 (KATO KAORU, et al); | [A]US4725293 (GUNDERSON JEFF [US]); | [A]EP0467668 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]); | [Y]EP0888804 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]); | [Y]US2002033023 (KROLL MARK W [US], et al); | [A]US2008159910 (DICK PAUL H [US], et al); | [A]US2015344209 (SAVUR SANJAY [AU], et al); | [Y]WO2019065885 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [A]EP3673746 (THERMO KING CORP [US]); | International search | [A]WO2008136540 (TEIJIN PHARMA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2016161191 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]WO2017038056 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2017219287 |