EP4327936 - HYDROGENATION CATALYST, AND FLOW-TYPE ORGANIC SYNTHESIS SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROGENATED ORGANIC COMPOUND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiyoda Corporation 4-6-2, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADO, Shigeru Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Toshiyuki Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | 03 /
KIRYU, Asako Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8765 / JP | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22791516.2 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022JP15479 | Priority number, date | JP20210072144 | 21.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021072144 | [2024/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022224741 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327936 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/44, B01J35/10, C07B61/00, C07C209/36, C07C211/52 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B01J23/44 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/643 (US);
B01J35/647 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/70 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP);
B01J37/0207 (EP);
B01J37/0242 (EP);
C07B61/00 (KR);
C07C209/36 (KR);
C07C209/365 (EP,US);
C07C211/52 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C209/365, C07C211/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | HYDRIERUNGSKATALYSATOR UND ORGANISCHES SYNTHESESYSTEM VOM STRÖMUNGSTYP UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HYDRIERTEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNG DAMIT | [2024/09] | English: | HYDROGENATION CATALYST, AND FLOW-TYPE ORGANIC SYNTHESIS SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROGENATED ORGANIC COMPOUND USING SAME | [2024/09] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'HYDROGÉNATION, ET SYSTÈME DE SYNTHÈSE ORGANIQUE DE TYPE À ÉCOULEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ ORGANIQUE HYDROGÉNÉ L'UTILISANT | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2023 | Translation filed | 17.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JPS5839646 (DU PONT); | [YX]WO2008117844 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP], et al); | [YX]JP2011529780 ; | [Y]JP2020124663 (CHIYODA CORP); | by applicant | JPS51122029 | JPS5235652B | JPH07133255 | JP2004277409 | JP4119144B | JP5599212B | JP6456204B |