EP4326144 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING A METABOLIC DIGITAL TWIN FOR CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mesh Bio Pte. Ltd. 10 Anson Road, 22-02 International Plaza Singapore 079903 / SG | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATAGOV, Arsen Singapore 418804 / SG | 02 /
WU, En-Tzu, Andrew Singapore 573894 / SG | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22792118.6 | 20.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022SG50236 | Priority number, date | SG20211004045U | 20.04.2021 Original published format: SG10202104045U | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022225460 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4326144 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G16H50/30, G06N20/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES DIGITALEN STOFFWECHSELZWILLINGS ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG KLINISCHER ENTSCHEIDUNGEN | [2024/09] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING A METABOLIC DIGITAL TWIN FOR CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT | [2024/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN DOUBLE NUMÉRIQUE MÉTABOLIQUE À DES FINS D'AIDE AUX DÉCISIONS CLINIQUES | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 08.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2024/09] | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 08.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 08.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 08.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2023 | Decision despatched | 08.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 08.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2021030637 (TWIN HEALTH INC [US]); |