Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024056217 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110483718 | 30.04.2021 | WO2022CN86277 | 12.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4325753 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110483718 | 30.04.2021 | WO2022CN86277 | 12.04.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022228108 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110483718 | 30.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115276892 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110483718 | 30.04.2021 |