EP4332108 - RETINOIC ACID RECEPTOR AGONIST, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, INTERMEDIATE, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangxi Kerui Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 188, Qingfeng Avenue, Zhanggong District Ganzhou, Jiangxi 341000 / CN | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Wenfang Shanghai 201715 / CN | 02 /
TAN, Yun Shanghai 201715 / CN | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22794879.1 | 26.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022CN89139 | Priority number, date | CN202110459864 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110459864 | [2024/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022228409 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332108 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08, A61K31/695, A61P17/10, A61P17/06, A61P17/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
C07F7/0812 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/695 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P17/06 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P17/10 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P27/02 (KR);
C07F7/081 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/0816 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07F7/083 (US);
C07F7/0832 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | RETINSÄUREREZEPTORAGONIST, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, ZWISCHENPRODUKT, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2024/10] | English: | RETINOIC ACID RECEPTOR AGONIST, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, INTERMEDIATE, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE | [2024/10] | French: | AGONISTE DU RÉCEPTEUR DE L'ACIDE RÉTINOÏQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, INTERMÉDIAIRE, COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ET UTILISATION | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2023 | Translation filed | 23.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1430596 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]WO2005056516 (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR], et al); | [A]WO2007068580 (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR], et al); | [A]CN101087752 (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR]); | [X]WO2015149072 (UNIV CHICAGO [US]); |