EP4331693 - MOVING IMAGE RECEPTION DEVICE, MOVING IMAGE TRANSMISSION DEVICE, MOVING IMAGE TRANSMISSION/RECEPTION SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIKAWA, Masakazu Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22795639.8 | 19.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022JP18208 | Priority number, date | JP20210077838 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021077838 | [2024/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022230726 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331693 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/35, A63F13/77, A63F13/86, H04N21/442, H04N21/6373 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04N21/6373 (EP);
H04L65/752 (US);
A63F13/35 (US);
A63F13/355 (EP);
A63F13/358 (EP);
H04N21/44209 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEWEGLICHE BILDER, ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEWEGLICHE BILDER, ÜBERTRAGUNGS-/EMPFANGSSYSTEM FÜR BEWEGLICHE BILDER, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2024/10] | English: | MOVING IMAGE RECEPTION DEVICE, MOVING IMAGE TRANSMISSION DEVICE, MOVING IMAGE TRANSMISSION/RECEPTION SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2024/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION D'IMAGES ANIMÉES, DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'IMAGES ANIMÉES, SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION/RÉCEPTION D'IMAGES ANIMÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2023 | Translation filed | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]WO2017179230 (SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]); | [AY]WO2021039983 (SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) |