EP4273652 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING PROCESS CHANGES BY REFLECTING KEY FACTORS IN COMMERCIAL CHEMICAL PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Gas Co., Ltd. (Sampyeong-dong) 332 Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13493 / KR | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Ung Gi Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 02 /
YEO, Sung Joo Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 03 /
KONG, Seung Hwan Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Min Ho Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Hae Bin Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Hee Dong Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 07 /
KYE, Young Gook Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 22796116.6 | 27.04.2022 | [2023/45] | WO2022KR05974 | Priority number, date | KR20210055081 | 28.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210055081 | [2023/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022231283 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273652 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
G05B23/0275 (EP,KR);
G05B23/0283 (EP,KR);
G06N5/022 (US);
G05B19/4183 (KR);
G05B23/0221 (EP,KR);
G06N20/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | G05B23/02, G05B19/418, G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE VON PROZESSÄNDERUNGEN DURCH REFLEXION VON SCHLÜSSELFAKTOREN IN EINEM KOMMERZIELLEN CHEMISCHEN PROZESS | [2023/45] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING PROCESS CHANGES BY REFLECTING KEY FACTORS IN COMMERCIAL CHEMICAL PROCESS | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE CHANGEMENTS DE PROCESSUS PAR RÉFLEXION DE FACTEURS CLÉS DANS UN PROCESSUS CHIMIQUE COMMERCIAL | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2023 | Translation filed | 04.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 04.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2024 | Observations by third parties | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006031749 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2003058206 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]KR20080105439 (UNIV SOGANG CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20190135445 (HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE COMPANY [US]); | [A]US2020064324 (SU HENG CHIA [US], et al); | [A]JP2020166749 (KANEKA CORP, et al) | by applicant | KR101508641B | KR20190098484 | KR102036956B | other | US2014365195 |