Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024216428 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210055886 | 29.04.2021 | WO2022KR06009 | 27.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024516263 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210055886 | 29.04.2021 | WO2022KR06009 | 27.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4332118 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210055886 | 29.04.2021 | WO2022KR06009 | 27.04.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022231298 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210055886 | 29.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220148745 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210055886 | 29.04.2021 |