Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118043296 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76983 | 28.09.2022 | EP21199920 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3226638 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76983 | 28.09.2022 | EP21199920 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022354565 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76983 | 28.09.2022 | EP21199920 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4352029 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76983 | 28.09.2022 | EP21199920 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112024000666 | 30.04.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76983 | 28.09.2022 | EP21199920 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2024003943 | 22.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP76983 | 28.09.2022 | EP21199920 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023052424 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21199920 | 29.09.2021 |