EP4352029 - SET CONTROL COMPOSITION FOR CEMENTITIOUS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACHSENHAUSER, Bernhard 83308 Trostberg / DE | 02 /
BANDIERA, Massimo 31100 Treviso / IT | 03 /
LORENZ, Klaus 83308 Trostberg / DE | 04 /
HIMMELEIN, Sabine 83308 Trostberg / DE | 05 /
WELDERT, Kai Steffen 83308 Trostberg / DE | 06 /
SCHWESIG, Peter 83308 Trostberg / DE | 07 /
KLEIN, Matthias 83308 Trostberg / DE | 08 /
FARRA, Ramzi 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Klaus Uwe Master Builders Solutions Deutschland GmbH EB/IP Dr.-Albert-Frank-Straße 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22797714.7 | 28.09.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022EP76983 | Priority number, date | EP20210199920 | 29.09.2021 Original published format: EP 21199920 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023052424 | Date: | 06.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4352029 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C04B40/00, C04B28/06, C04B28/16, C04B103/22 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
C04B28/06 (EP);
C04B28/065 (EP);
C04B28/16 (EP);
C04B40/0039 (EP);
C04B2103/22 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/16, C04B7/02, C04B14/06, C04B14/28, C04B20/0076, C04B22/106, C04B24/02, C04B24/06, C04B24/2647 (EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B22/0013, C04B22/106, C04B24/02, C04B24/06, C04B24/2641, C04B2103/408 (EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B22/0013, C04B22/106, C04B24/06, C04B24/38, C04B2103/408 (EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B22/0013, C04B22/10, C04B24/06, C04B24/10, C04B24/2641, C04B2103/408 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABBINDUNGSSTEUERUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ZEMENTÖSE SYSTEME | [2024/16] | English: | SET CONTROL COMPOSITION FOR CEMENTITIOUS SYSTEMS | [2024/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉGULATION DE PRISE DESTINÉE À DES SYSTÈMES CIMENTAIRES | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 10.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US9868674 (LI WEIFENG [CN], et al); | [A]WO2020173723 (BASF SE [DE]) | by applicant | US4175975 | US4430469 | DE4411797 | CH686186 | CA2172004 | EP0753488 | US5792252 | EP0894811 | US6555683 | EP1851256 | WO2008012438 | WO2009103579 | EP2463314 | WO2014013077 | WO2019077050 |