EP4335858 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING SOPHOROLIPID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macrocare Tech., Ltd. 32 Gangni 1-gil, Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 28126 / KR | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Moo Sung Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16527 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sang Rin Seoul 04959 / KR | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Gabriella Diana, et al Modiano & Partners SA Steinsdorfstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/11] | Modiano, Gabriella Diana, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Steinsdorfstrasse, 14 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22799011.6 | 11.04.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022KR05170 | Priority number, date | KR20210057233 | 03.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210057233 | [2024/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022234966 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4335858 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/10, C07H1/00, C12P19/44, C07B63/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C12P19/44 (EP,KR);
C07H15/10 (EP,KR);
C07H1/00 (EP,KR);
C07B63/00 (KR);
C12R2001/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON SOPHOROLIPID | [2024/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PURIFYING SOPHOROLIPID | [2024/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE SOPHOROLIPIDE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | Translation filed | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN106282264 (BAILANDE BIOCHEMICAL (HAIMEN) CO LTD); | [A]KR20190125878 (KOREA RES INST CHEMICAL TECH [KR]); | by applicant | EP2821495 |