EP4334198 - FOOT PAD FOR SUBMERGED MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stationkeep LLC 187 Concord Street Portland, ME 04103-3103 / US | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKERS, Richard, H. Portland, ME 04103-3103 / US | 02 /
LANDON, Melissa, E. Portland, ME 04103-3103 / US | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22799729.3 | 06.05.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022US28204 | Priority number, date | US202163185549P | 07.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163185549 P | US202163225638P | 26.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163225638 P | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022236143 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4334198 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/27, B63B21/26, B63B21/24, E02D27/50, E02D27/52, B63B21/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
B63B21/27 (EP);
E02D15/08 (EP);
E02D27/525 (EP);
E02D2250/0053 (EP);
E02D27/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | FUSSPOLSTER FÜR UNTERWASSERMASCHINE | [2024/11] | English: | FOOT PAD FOR SUBMERGED MACHINERY | [2024/11] | French: | TALON POUR MACHINE IMMERGÉE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4266888 (BAYER KARL, et al) [Y] 1-6 * ; figures 1-2; columns 4-5 * [A] 9-12; | [YA]US4669915 (SHATTO JR HOWARD L [US]) [Y] 1-8 * ; figures 2-3; columns 4-8 * [A] 9-12; | [YA]US2003145835 (DJORDJEVIC ILIJA [US]) [Y] 1,7-8 * ; figures 2-3; paragraphs [0016], [0029] * [A] 9-12; | [Y]CN111619736 (UNIV ZHEJIANG OCEAN) [Y] 5-6* ; see machine translation; entire document * |