Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4427098 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP22802399 US2022047789W US202217979348



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023137707Global Dossier 04.05.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202217979348 02.11.2022
US202163274684 02.11.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4427098Global Dossier 11.09.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022US47789 26.10.2022
US202163274684 02.11.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023081041Global Dossier 11.05.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202163274684 02.11.2021