EP4343204 - ILLUMINATION DEVICE AND VEHICLE LAMP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IDO, Hiroaki Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 02 /
KAMEI, Matsuo Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 03 /
IWAMOTO, Yoshihisa Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22804647.0 | 16.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022JP20404 | Priority number, date | JP20210086065 | 21.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021086065 | [2024/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022244736 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4343204 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21Y101/00, F21Y115/10, F21Y115/30, F21S41/148, F21S41/20, F21S41/25, F21S41/64, F21W102/10, G02F1/13 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
F21S41/147 (EP,US);
F21S41/645 (US);
F21S41/135 (US);
F21S41/20 (EP);
F21S41/25 (EP);
F21S41/27 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUGLAMPENSYSTEM | [2024/13] | English: | ILLUMINATION DEVICE AND VEHICLE LAMP SYSTEM | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET SYSTÈME DE LAMPE DE VÉHICULE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | Translation filed | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JPH09500982 ; | [AY]JP2018185896 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [AY]JP2020017367 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2019128449 |