EP4343801 - WATER-IMPERMEABLE DEGASSING FILM FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya Kagacho 1-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Miho Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22804762.7 | 19.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022JP20888 | Priority number, date | JP20210084981 | 19.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021084981 | [2024/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022244853 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4343801 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01G11/78, H01G9/00, H01G9/12, H01M50/103, H01M50/105, H01M50/107, H01M50/119, H01M50/121, H01M50/129, H01M50/184, H01M50/317 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H01M50/105 (EP,KR);
H01M50/317 (EP,KR);
H01M50/394 (EP,US);
H01G11/20 (EP);
H01G11/78 (EP,KR);
H01G9/12 (EP,KR);
H01M50/103 (EP);
H01M50/107 (EP);
H01M50/119 (EP,KR);
H01M50/121 (KR);
H01M50/129 (EP,KR);
H01M50/184 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | WASSERDICHTE ENTGASUNGSFOLIE FÜR ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2024/13] | English: | WATER-IMPERMEABLE DEGASSING FILM FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE | [2024/13] | French: | FILM DE DÉGAZAGE IMPERMÉABLE À L'EAU POUR DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2023 | Translation filed | 07.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]JP2016103631 (MUTSUKI DENKI KK); | [AX]WO2018110067 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [PX]WO2022024713 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2010153841 | JP2016031934 |