EP4352220 - VIRAL VECTOR PRODUCTION SYSTEMS, ENGINEERED CELLS FOR VIRAL VECTOR PRODUCTION, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asimov Inc. 1325 Boylstone Street, Suite 500 Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/16] | For all designated states Asimov, Inc. 1325 Boylston Street Suite 500 Boston MA 02215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAM, Jeremy J. Boston, MA 02215 / US | 02 /
STACH, Christopher S. Boston, MA 02215 / US | 03 /
NIELSEN, Alec A., K. Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22805297.3 | 17.05.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022US29601 | Priority number, date | US202163189771P | 18.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163189771 P | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022245803 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4352220 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/113, C12N15/86, C12N9/22 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/113 (KR);
C12N9/22 (KR,US);
C12N2310/20 (KR,US);
C12N2740/15043 (US);
C12N2740/15052 (US);
C12N2740/16043 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2740/16052 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2750/14043 (US);
C12N2750/14052 (US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | 14.02.2024 | ME | 14.02.2024 | Validation states | KH | 14.02.2024 | MA | 14.02.2024 | MD | 14.02.2024 | TN | 14.02.2024 | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VIRALEN VEKTOREN, MANIPULIERTE ZELLEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VIRALEN VEKTOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/16] | English: | VIRAL VECTOR PRODUCTION SYSTEMS, ENGINEERED CELLS FOR VIRAL VECTOR PRODUCTION, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2024/16] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE PRODUCTION DE VECTEURS VIRAUX, CELLULES MODIFIÉES POUR LA PRODUCTION DE VECTEURS VIRAUX ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010175141 (COLLINS JAMES J [US], et al); | [XY]US2018110877 (WILSON JAMES M [US], et al); | [Y]US2020199556 (HSU PATRICK D [US], et al) |