EP4341693 - SANDWICH IMMUNOASSAY DEVICES USING ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC TO THE EXOSOMES CONTAINING TARGET ANALYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 2PI-sigma Corporation 4343 Von Karman Ave Suite 250 Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATAMIAN, Mehdi Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22805431.8 | 18.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022US29898 | Priority number, date | US202163189682P | 18.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163189682 P | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022245990 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4341693 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558, G01N33/53, G01N33/543 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/54388 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
B01L3/50273 (EP);
B01L9/52 (US);
G01N27/3275 (US);
B01L2200/026 (US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | SANDWICH-IMMUNOASSAY-VORRICHTUNGEN MIT FÜR DIE EXOSOMEN MIT ZIELANALYTEN SPEZIFISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERN | [2024/13] | English: | SANDWICH IMMUNOASSAY DEVICES USING ANTIBODIES SPECIFIC TO THE EXOSOMES CONTAINING TARGET ANALYTES | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE EN SANDWICH UTILISANT DES ANTICORPS SPÉCIFIQUES DES EXOSOMES CONTENANT DES ANALYTES CIBLES | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 07.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7344893 (KIRKEGAARD LESLIE [US], et al); | [A]US8003407 (ZHOU SILIANG [US], et al); | [A]US10739297 (HATAMIAN MEHDI [US]); | [A]US2020319158 (GOREWIT RONALD [US]); | [A]US2021033605 (HOLLIDT JÖRG-M [DE], et al) |