EP4340429 - BASE STATION, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANO Hiroaki Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22807069.4 | 24.02.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022JP07454 | Priority number, date | JP20210081923 | 13.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021081923 | [2024/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022239362 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4340429 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/28, H04W24/10 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W72/54 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W24/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2024/12] | English: | BASE STATION, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2024/12] | French: | STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2023 | Translation filed | 06.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2014007669 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [A]JP2015126414 (NTT DOCOMO INC); |