EP4338746 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING ISATIS TINCTORIA LEAF EXTRACT FOR PREVENTING, RELIEVING, OR TREATING INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mthera Pharma Co., Ltd. 102-ho 1F, 38 Magokjungang 8-ro 1-gil Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOHN, Mi Won Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16822 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sinyeon Seoul 07063 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Jin Gyu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14694 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Se Woong Seoul 07522 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Sang Cheol Seoul 03115 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Mijeong Seoul 07792 / KR | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Duncombe, Jessica, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22807904.2 | 13.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022KR06932 | Priority number, date | KR20210062846 | 14.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210062846 | [2024/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022240257 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4338746 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/315, A61P1/00, A61P29/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K36/315 (EP,US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61K2236/333 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ISATIS TINCTORIA-BLATTEXTRAKT ZUR VORBEUGUNG, LINDERUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHER DARMERKRANKUNG | [2024/12] | English: | COMPOSITION CONTAINING ISATIS TINCTORIA LEAF EXTRACT FOR PREVENTING, RELIEVING, OR TREATING INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE | [2024/12] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT DE FEUILLE D'ISATIS TINCTORIA POUR LA PRÉVENTION, L'ATTÉNUATION OU LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE INTESTINALE INFLAMMATOIRE | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2023 | Translation filed | 24.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 30.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20110132407 (VIVA PHARMACEUTICAL INC [CA]) [A] 1-9 * See entire document. *; | [A]CN103893457 (WANG HONG) [A] 1-9 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20160115380 (KOREA INST ORIENTAL MEDICINE [KR]) [A] 1-9* See entire document. *; | [Y] - Lee, Hwa-Dong, "Isolation of components from isatidis folium and their cosmeceutical activities", Ph.D. thesis, KR, (20121201), pages 1 - 168, XP009541079 [Y] 1-9 * See pages 16, 32-35, 124-125, 129, 131, 135, 138 and 140-141. * | [Y] - Lee, Dong-Hui, "Functional Evaluation Guide for Health Functional Foods (Complainant's Guide) -Related to Intestinal Health-", KR, vol. Guide-0128-02, (20200901), pages 1 - 48, Government Publications Registration Number (GPRN) , URL: https://www.mfds.go.kr/brd/m_1060/view.do?seq=14660, (20101023), XP009541871 [Y] 1-9 * See pages 22-23. * | [A] - Park Sook-Jahr, Lee Jong-Rok, Jo Mi-Jeong, Park Sang-Mi, Buyn Sung-Hui, Cho Il-Je, Kim Sang-Chan, "Effects of Isatidis Radix and it's Active Component, Tryptanthrin on the Production of Inflammatory Mediators in Lipopolysaccharide-activated Raw264.7 Cells", The Journal of Korean Medicine Ophthalmology and Otolaryngology and Dermatology, (20110425), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.6114/jkood.2011.24.1.064, ISSN 1738-6640, pages 64 - 77, XP093003792 [A] 1-9 * See entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.6114/jkood.2011.24.1.064 | by applicant | KR101710730B | - Scientific Reports, (20200000), vol. 10 | - Nutrients, (20190000), vol. 11, no. 11, page 2776 | - Biol. Pharm. Bull., (20200000), vol. 43, pages 450 - 457 |