EP4337381 - DEVICE FOR ALLOWING PRESSURIZATION OF FLUID IN A MICROFLUIDIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burst Diagnostics Llc 308 E Vine Dr Suite 104 Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENRY, Nathan Windsor, CO 80550 / US | 02 /
HENRY, Charles, S. Fort Collins, CO 80528 / US | 03 /
CARRELL, Cody Sun Prairie, WI 53590 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22808277.2 | 11.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022US28800 | Priority number, date | US202163201804P | 13.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163201804 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022241009 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4337381 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP);
B01L3/50273 (US);
B01L3/5029 (EP);
G01N1/10 (US);
B01L2200/027 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0825 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER DRUCKBEAUFSCHLAGUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT IN EINER MIKROFLUIDISCHEN DIAGNOSEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR ALLOWING PRESSURIZATION OF FLUID IN A MICROFLUIDIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE | [2024/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LA MISE SOUS PRESSION D'UN FLUIDE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC MICROFLUIDIQUE | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010274155 (BATTRELL C FREDERICK [US], et al); | [A]US2012329081 (BENNION NERYS [GB], et al); | [A]US2016116381 (HAUPT STEVEN G [US], et al); | [XA]US2018372595 (PAIS ANDREA MARIA DOMINIC [US], et al); | [A]US2019086380 (HARDING WESTON F [US], et al) |