EP4338256 - DYNAMICALLY CONFIGURABLE HARDWARE SYSTEM FOR MOTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tau Motors, Inc. 1104 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNINGTON III, Walter Wesley Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
SWINT, Ethan Bagget Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
PREINDL, Matthias New York, NY 10027 / US | 04 /
STEVENSON, Gregory Gordon San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 05 /
RUBIN, Mathew, J Indianapolis, IN 46254 / US | 06 /
DA COSTA, Anthony Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22808446.3 | 13.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022US29276 | Priority number, date | US202163188374P | 13.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163188374 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022241269 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4338256 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/02, H02K1/16, H02K1/24, H02K11/028, H02P23/14 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H02P23/14 (EP,KR);
H02P25/20 (KR,US);
H02K1/24 (KR);
H02P25/08 (KR);
H02P6/08 (EP,KR);
H02P7/06 (KR);
H02P2207/07 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCH KONFIGURIERBARES HARDWARESYSTEM FÜR MOTORSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2024/12] | English: | DYNAMICALLY CONFIGURABLE HARDWARE SYSTEM FOR MOTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2024/12] | French: | SYSTÈME MATÉRIEL CONFIGURABLE DYNAMIQUEMENT POUR SYSTÈME DE MOTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 22.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4338534 (BROADWAY ALEXANDER R W, et al); | [A]US2006273686 (EDELSON JONATHAN S [US], et al); | [A]US2015048705 (DAVEY KENT R [US], et al) |