EP4337413 - MATERIAL PROCESSING BY TURBO BURST ULTRAFAST LASER PULSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSSEINI, S., Abbas Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22808455.4 | 13.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022US29299 | Priority number, date | US202163188327P | 13.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163188327 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022241282 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4337413 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/362, B23K26/402, G02B3/00, H01S3/09, B23K26/0622, B23K26/082, C03B33/09, C03C14/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B23K26/0624 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/364 (KR,US);
B23K26/0648 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/53 (EP,KR);
B23K2103/54 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | MATERIALVERARBEITUNG DURCH ULTRASCHNELLEN LASERIMPULS MIT TURBO-BURST | [2024/12] | English: | MATERIAL PROCESSING BY TURBO BURST ULTRAFAST LASER PULSE | [2024/12] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MATÉRIAU PAR IMPULSION LASER ULTRARAPIDE EN RAFALE | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2015151380 (HOSSEINI S ABBAS [US]) [X] 11, 13, 15 * ; para. [0008]-[0099] * [Y] 1-10, 12, 14; | [Y]US2017129054 (DITTLI ADAM [US]) [Y] 1-10, 12, 14 * ; para.[0024]-[0038] *; | [Y]FR3092266 (AMPLITUDE SYSTEMES [FR], et al) [Y] 1-10, 12, 14* ; description, pages 1-3 * |