EP4293538 - HOT EVENT PRESENTATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLICATION, AND DEVICE, MEDIUM AND PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Zitiao Network Technology Co., Ltd. 0207, 2/F, Building 4 Zijin Digital Park Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zeyu Beijing 100086 / CN | 02 /
LI, Zhuang Beijing 100086 / CN | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22810314.9 | 29.04.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022CN90276 | Priority number, date | CN202110574046 | 25.05.2021 Original published format: CN202110574046 | [2023/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022247585 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293538 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/9535, G06F16/9538 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G06F16/743 (EP);
G06F16/44 (EP,CN);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F16/435 (CN);
G06F16/4387 (EP);
G06F16/738 (EP);
G06F16/748 (EP);
G06F16/9535 (CN);
G06F16/957 (CN);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06Q30/0252 (EP);
G06Q50/01 (EP);
H04L51/10 (EP);
H04L51/52 (EP);
H04M1/72472 (EP);
H04N21/4312 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/47217 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | HEISSEREIGNISPRÄSENTATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG SOWIE VORRICHTUNG, MEDIUM UND PRODUKT | [2023/51] | English: | HOT EVENT PRESENTATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLICATION, AND DEVICE, MEDIUM AND PRODUCT | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRÉSENTATION D'ÉVÉNEMENT CHAUD POUR APPLICATION, ET DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT ET PRODUIT | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2023 | Translation filed | 12.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016261919 (MANDEL BILL [US], et al); | [I]EP3188106 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US2017347144 (DA FONSECA CAROLINE [FR], et al); | [A]US2019141402 (CORNELL ALEX DOUGLAS [US]) | International search | [A]JP2006196086 (ULEAD SYSTEMS INC); | [X]CN102640148 (NOKIA CORP); | [A]CN105242845 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD); | [A]CN112689189 (BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECH CO LTD) |