Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4350855 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280037372 EP22811056 JP2022017662W JP2023523348 US202218556009



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024213606Global Dossier 27.06.2024A1
Priority number Date
JP2021086711 24.05.2021
WO2022JP17662 13.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7526364BGlobal Dossier 31.07.2024B2
JPWO2022249782 01.12.2022A1
Priority number Date
JP2021086711 24.05.2021
WO2022JP17662 13.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN117480677Global Dossier 30.01.2024A
Priority number Date
JP2021086711 24.05.2021
WO2022JP17662 13.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4350855Global Dossier 10.04.2024A1
Priority number Date
JP2021086711 24.05.2021
WO2022JP17662 13.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022249782Global Dossier 01.12.2022A1
Priority number Date
JP2021086711 24.05.2021