EP4349930 - HEAT-RESISTANT ACRYLIC ADHESIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cemedine Co., Ltd. 11-2 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8620 / JP | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTANI, Jun Tokyo 141-8620 / JP | 02 /
KONNO, Makoto Tokyo 141-8620 / JP | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22811237.1 | 19.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022JP20781 | Priority number, date | JP20210087954 | 25.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021087954 | [2024/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022249965 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349930 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J4/00, C08F290/06, C09J11/06 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C09J4/06 (EP,US);
C09J139/04 (US);
C08F290/067 (EP);
C09J11/08 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08F290/067, C08F220/1811, C08F220/06, C08F220/20, C08F220/1808, C08F230/02 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/1811, C08F220/06, C08F220/58, C08F230/02 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/1811, C08F220/14, C08F220/06, C08F230/02 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/1811, C08F220/282, C08F220/06, C08F230/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | HITZEBESTÄNDIGE ACRYLKLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2024/15] | English: | HEAT-RESISTANT ACRYLIC ADHESIVE COMPOSITION | [2024/15] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE ACRYLIQUE RÉSISTANTE À LA CHALEUR | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2023 | Translation filed | 11.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0297585 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2000345111 (THREE M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES); | [A]US2002099138 (FUJII SANA [JP], et al); | [A]JP2017125178 (DENKA CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH07268050 | JPH09241585 | JP2000355647 | JP2015182248 | JP2018172565 | JP2018188602 | JP2019089889 | WO2020100832 |