EP4349205 - FOOT SHAPE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND FOOT SHAPE MEASUREMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WACOAL CORP. 29, Nakajima-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8530 / JP | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAYAMA Motohide Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-0004 / JP | 02 /
SEIKE Nozomu Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8530 / JP | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22811345.2 | 25.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022JP21365 | Priority number, date | JP20210090163 | 28.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021090163 | [2024/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022250075 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349205 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A43D1/02, G01B11/24 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP);
G01B11/24 (EP,US);
A43D1/02 (EP);
A43D1/025 (EP);
A43D1/06 (EP);
G06Q30/015 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | FUSSFORMMESSSYSTEM UND FUSSFORMMESSVERFAHREN | [2024/15] | English: | FOOT SHAPE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND FOOT SHAPE MEASUREMENT METHOD | [2024/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE DE FORME DE PIED ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE FORME DE PIED | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2023 | Translation filed | 15.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000090272 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO, et al); | [A]WO0240941 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al); | [A]JP2002177015 (ISHIMARU HISAYO) | by applicant | JP2003108831 |