EP4346566 - ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE BASED CARDIAC EVENT PREDICTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tempus AI, Inc. 600 West Chicago Avenue, Suite 510 Chicago, IL 60654 / US | For all designated states Geisinger Clinic 100 N. Academy Avenue Danville, PA 17821 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEMANI, Arun Chicago, IL 60654 / US | 02 /
SUNG-YUL LEE, Greg Chicago, IL 60654 / US | 03 /
STEINHUBL, Steve Chicago, IL 60654 / US | 04 /
ULLOA-CERNA, Alvaro Danville, PA 17821 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22812343.6 | 31.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US31670 | Priority number, date | US202163194923P | 28.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163194923 P | US202163202436P | 10.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163202436 P | US202163224850P | 22.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163224850 P | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022251750 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4346566 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G06N20/00, G06N3/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
A61B5/28 (EP,US);
A61B5/318 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
G16H10/40 (EP);
G16H15/00 (EP);
G16H20/10 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP);
G16H20/60 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | AUF KÜNSTLICHER INTELLIGENZ BASIERENDE HERZEREIGNISPRÄDIKTORSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2024/15] | English: | ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE BASED CARDIAC EVENT PREDICTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2024/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉDICTION D'ÉVÉNEMENTS CARDIAQUES REPOSANT SUR L'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015324527 (SIEGEL NEIL G [US], et al); | [Y]US2020226757 (HARE II JAMES OTIS [SG], et al); | [Y]US2021076960 (FORNWALT BRANDON K [US], et al) |