Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4422913 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP22813798 US2022047885W US202217973762



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023128979Global Dossier 27.04.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202217973762 26.10.2022
US202163272382 27.10.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4422913Global Dossier 04.09.2024A2
Priority number Date
WO2022US47885 26.10.2022
US202163272382 27.10.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023076388Global Dossier 01.06.2023A3
WO2023076388 04.05.2023A2
Priority number Date
US202163272382 27.10.2021