EP4349368 - THERAPY USING COMBINATION OF ANTI-CD26 ANTIBODY AND IMMUNE CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Y'S AC Co., Ltd. 1-10-11 Ebisu-Nishi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0021 / JP | For all designated states Juntendo Educational Foundation 2-1-1, Hongo Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Chikao Tokyo 156-0043 / JP | 02 /
HATANO, Ryo Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-0042 / JP | 03 /
OHNUMA, Kei Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 04 /
KANEKO, Yutaro Tokyo 150-0021 / JP | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22815998.4 | 27.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022JP21738 | Priority number, date | JP20210091761 | 31.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021091761 | [2024/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022255248 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349368 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K45/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/28 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
A61K2039/507 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPIE MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS ANTI-CD26-ANTIKÖRPER UND IMMUNCHECKPOINT-INHIBITOR | [2024/15] | English: | THERAPY USING COMBINATION OF ANTI-CD26 ANTIBODY AND IMMUNE CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR | [2024/15] | French: | THÉRAPIE UTILISANT UNE COMBINAISON D'ANTICORPS ANTI-CD26 ET D'INHIBITEUR DE POINT DE CONTRÔLE IMMUNITAIRE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2023 | Translation filed | 28.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4816567 | WO9958572 | WO0214462 | WO03054172 | WO03064630 | WO2004009823 | WO2007114876 | WO2017043613 |