EP4349169 - COMPOSITION HAVING ENHANCED D-TAGATOSE PLANT-BLIGHT-CONTROLLING EFFECT AND RAIN RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals Crop & Life Solutions, Inc. 1-19-1 Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHARA Toshiaki Yasu-shi, Shiga 520-2362 / JP | 02 /
KITANO Tomoyuki Yasu-shi, Shiga 520-2362 / JP | 03 /
FUKUMOTO Takeshi Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | 04 /
SASAKURA Niiha Shinshiro-shi, Aichi 441-1315 / JP | 05 /
OKAMOTO Keita Yasu-shi, Shiga 520-2362 / JP | 06 /
NOMURA Kazuki Yasu-shi, Shiga 520-2362 / JP | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22816144.4 | 01.06.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022JP22264 | Priority number, date | JP20210093226 | 02.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021093226 | [2024/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022255398 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349169 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/16, A01N25/00, A01N25/24, A01P3/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A01P3/00 (EP,KR,US);
A01N35/02 (KR);
A01N25/24 (US);
A01N25/04 (KR,US);
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
A01P1/00 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/16, A01N25/30, A01N25/04, A01N25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Validation states | MA | 09.11.2023 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER D-TAGATOSE-PFLANZENBLIGHT-KONTROLLWIRKUNG UND REGENBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2024/15] | English: | COMPOSITION HAVING ENHANCED D-TAGATOSE PLANT-BLIGHT-CONTROLLING EFFECT AND RAIN RESISTANCE | [2024/15] | French: | COMPOSITION PRÉSENTANT UN EFFET DE LUTTE CONTRE LE FLÉTRISSEMENT VÉGÉTAL D-TAGATOSE ET UNE RÉSISTANCE À LA PLUIE AMÉLIORÉS | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2023 | Translation filed | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9746092 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004505025 ; | [Y]JP2004189642 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO); | [A]WO2005006863 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2010021121 (MITSUI CHEMICALS AGRO INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2011219406 (NISSHIN KAGAKU KENKYUSHO:KK); | [Y]JP2011251917 (TOHO CHEM IND CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2010021121 | WO2014142074 |