EP4346986 - NEEDLE-LESS ACCESS VIAL AND CAP FOR THE ASEPTIC SAMPLING AND STORAGE OF LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOVER MOTION, INC. 9980 Huennekens Street, Suite 140 San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/15] | For all designated states Invetech, Inc. 9980 Huennekens Street Suite 140 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARBYSHIRE, Paul 3204 Bentleigh / AU | 02 /
DUNCAN, Phillip 3658 Bradford / AU | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22816677.3 | 27.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US31295 | Priority number, date | US202117335737 | 01.06.2021 Original published format: US202117335737 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022256248 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4346986 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/10, A61M39/12, A61M39/18, B01L3/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
B01L3/50825 (EP,KR,US);
A01N1/0268 (EP,US);
B01L3/561 (EP,KR);
A01N1/0263 (EP);
A61J1/1418 (US);
A61J1/1425 (US);
B01L2200/026 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/0605 (KR,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/085 (US);
B01L2200/141 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/042 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | NADELLOSE ZUGANGSPHIOLE UND KAPPE ZUR ASEPTISCHEN PROBENAHME UND LAGERUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2024/15] | English: | NEEDLE-LESS ACCESS VIAL AND CAP FOR THE ASEPTIC SAMPLING AND STORAGE OF LIQUIDS | [2024/15] | French: | FLACON ET BOUCHON À ACCÈS SANS AIGUILLE POUR L'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE ASEPTIQUE ET LE STOCKAGE DE LIQUIDES | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 17.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4541537 (SAILOR CLIFFORD L [US]); | [A]US6056731 (KOETKE CLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al); | [A]DE202006012253U (PACIFIC HOSPITAL SUPPLY CO LTD [TW]); | [A]US2009148934 (WOODS ERIK JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2019100747 (ISMAGILOV RUSTEM [US], et al) |