EP4348501 - ILLUMINABLE WEIGHTED CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPI Card Group -Colorado, Inc. 10026 W. San Juan Way Littleton, Colorado 80127 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSTELLER, Barry Castle Pines, Colorado 80108 / US | 02 /
WALTER, Diana Centennial, Colorado 80122 / US | 03 /
COLLERAN, Jim Centennial, Colorado 80121 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Robin Jonathan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22816842.3 | 02.06.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US31935 | Priority number, date | US202163195753P | 02.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163195753 P | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022256511 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4348501 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/07, G07F7/08 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/07705 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/02 (EP,KR);
G06K19/07722 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07773 (KR);
G07F7/0846 (KR);
G07F7/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTBARE GEWICHTETE KARTE | [2024/15] | English: | ILLUMINABLE WEIGHTED CARD | [2024/15] | French: | CARTE PONDÉRÉE POUVANT ÊTRE ÉCLAIRÉE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 11.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2015269477 (FINN DAVID [IE], et al); | [A]US2018343741 (WILLIAMS RICHARD K [US], et al); | [YA]US2020160135 (LOWE ADAM [US]); | [XYA]US2021056371 (MOSTELLER BARRY ROY [US]); | [A]US2021110230 (CHENG MENG-JEN [TW]) |