EP4347519 - FINE FIBER INSULATION PRODUCT WITH IMPROVED MATERIAL EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owens-Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, OH 43659 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANT, Larry Westerville, Ohio 43082 / US | 02 /
GURR, Dan Newark, Ohio 43055 / US | 03 /
BOONE, Teno Columbus, Ohio 43206 / US | 04 /
TSAI, Chung-Ying Granville, Ohio 43023 / US | 05 /
CHEN, Liang New Albany, Ohio 43054 / US | 06 /
MUELLER, Gert New Albany, Ohio 43054 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22816900.9 | 03.06.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US32066 | Priority number, date | US202163196895P | 04.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163196895 P | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022256596 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4347519 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C03C13/00, E04B1/76, E04B1/78 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
D04H1/4218 (EP,KR);
C08K7/14 (US);
D04H1/4391 (EP,KR);
D04H1/551 (KR);
D04H1/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | FEINFASERISOLIERPRODUKT MIT VERBESSERTER MATERIALEFFIZIENZ | [2024/15] | English: | FINE FIBER INSULATION PRODUCT WITH IMPROVED MATERIAL EFFICIENCY | [2024/15] | French: | PRODUIT D'ISOLATION À FIBRES FINES DOTÉ D'UNE EFFICACITÉ DE MATÉRIAU AMÉLIORÉE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009324915 (SWIFT BRIAN LEE [US], et al); | [A]US2013082205 (MUELLER GERT R [US], et al); | [A]US2015118434 (NAGARAJAN VENKATA S [US], et al); | [A]US2017198472 (EVANS MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2018339491 (HURSIT EREN [US], et al) |