Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240018467 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022JP23102 | 08.06.2022 | JP2021096215 | 08.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117460928 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022JP23102 | 08.06.2022 | JP2021096215 | 08.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4354090 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022JP23102 | 08.06.2022 | JP2021096215 | 08.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022260071 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021096215 | 08.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022187943 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021096215 | 08.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202305325 | 01.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021096215 | 08.06.2021 |