Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
21.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.01.2024 | Change - representative | |
08.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.12.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |