Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023177968 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217838134 | 10.06.2022 | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022399936 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | US202217838075 | 10.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022397917 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | US202217838073 | 10.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12080024 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2024 | B2 | US2022398806 | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | US202217838082 | 10.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4352586 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | WO2022US72890 | 10.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4352540 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US72887 | 10.06.2022 | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4351968 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US72885 | 10.06.2022 | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117859074 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US72887 | 10.06.2022 | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117858834 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US72885 | 10.06.2022 | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117795447 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | WO2022US72890 | 10.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117769639 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US72886 | 10.06.2022 | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4352455 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US72886 | 10.06.2022 | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022261678 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022261676 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022261675 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022261674 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163209392 | 11.06.2021 |