EP4184349 - OBJECT RECOMMENDATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Lijuan Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 22822250.1 | 16.03.2022 | [2023/21] | WO2022CN81122 | Priority number, date | CN202111143903 | 28.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111143903 | [2023/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023050732 | Date: | 06.04.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184349 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.04.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/538, G06F16/583 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G06F16/538 (EP);
G06F16/535 (CN);
G06F16/583 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/55 (US);
G06V10/44 (US);
G06V10/761 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/21] | G06F16/535, G06F16/583 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBJEKTEMPFEHLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/21] | English: | OBJECT RECOMMENDATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECOMMANDATION D'OBJET | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2019183173 (A9 COM INC [US]); | [A]US2020401616 (TSUJI AYANA [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]CN105320703 (UNIV BEIJING); | [Y]CN106202362 (TCL GROUP CO LTD); | [A]CN110110110 (HANGZHOU HIKVISION DIGITAL TEC); | [PX]CN113868453 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TECH CO LTD) |