EP4335940 - STRAIGHT GRATE-BASED PRE-REDUCED PELLET PREPARATION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL CO., LTD. No.885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jian Shanghai 201900 / CN | 02 /
MAO, Xiaoming Shanghai 201900 / CN | 03 /
XU, Wanren Shanghai 201900 / CN | 04 /
XIONG, Lin Shanghai 201900 / CN | 05 /
XU, Haifa Shanghai 201900 / CN | 06 /
SHEN, Haijia Shanghai 201900 / CN | 07 /
LIU, Siyang Shanghai 201900 / CN | 08 /
LIU, Feng Shanghai 201900 / CN | 09 /
YOU, Yifeng Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22824285.5 | 16.06.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022CN99170 | Priority number, date | CN202110676087 | 18.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110676087 | [2024/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022262812 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4335940 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22B34/22, C22B1/02, C22B34/12, C22B5/12, C22B1/242, C21B13/02 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C21B13/0073 (EP,CN);
C21B13/14 (EP,CN);
C21B13/0046 (EP,CN);
C21B13/02 (EP,CN);
C21B13/029 (CN);
C22B1/20 (EP);
C22B1/22 (EP,CN);
C22B1/2406 (EP,CN);
C22B1/2413 (EP);
C22B1/243 (EP,CN);
C21B2100/20 (EP);
C21B2100/44 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VORREDUZIERTEN PELLETS AUF BASIS GERADER ROSTE | [2024/11] | English: | STRAIGHT GRATE-BASED PRE-REDUCED PELLET PREPARATION DEVICE AND METHOD | [2024/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BOULETTES PRÉALABLEMENT RÉDUITES SUR GRILLE RECTILIGNE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2023 | Translation filed | 06.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1004006 (HUETTENWERK OBERHAUSEN AG); | [A]JPS52107213 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [X]CN102899435 (BEIJING SHENWU ENVIRONMENTAL ENERGY TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [X]CN103255255 (CISDI ENG CO LTD); | [A]CN110106303 (TANG JIA); | [X]CN110484720 (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH); | [A]CN112577313 (SHANGHAI MEISHAN IRON & STEEL CO LTD) | by applicant | CN103261446B | CN103898265B | CN103290159B | CN103608468B | CN105408500 | CN107304460B | CN110484672 | CN112159880 |