EP4335548 - PARTICULATE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATALER CORPORATION 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Masaya Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | 02 /
ONOE, Ryota Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | 03 /
TASAKI, Ryo Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | 04 /
IWAI, Momoko Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | 05 /
MATSUSHITA, Yamato Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22824925.6 | 10.06.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022JP23453 | Priority number, date | JP20210100551 | 17.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021100551 | [2024/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022264935 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4335548 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/56, B01D53/94, B01J23/63, F01N3/022, F01N3/035, F01N3/10, F01N3/24, F01N3/28, B01J37/02 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
F01N3/0222 (EP);
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP);
B01J35/56 (EP);
B01J37/0244 (EP);
B01J37/0248 (EP);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N3/28 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/407 (EP);
B01D2255/908 (EP);
B01D2255/9155 (EP,US);
F01N2330/00 (EP);
F01N2330/30 (EP);
F01N2370/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/11] | B01J35/04, B01D53/94, B01J23/63, F01N3/022, F01N3/035, F01N3/10, F01N3/24, F01N3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | PARTIKELFILTER | [2024/11] | English: | PARTICULATE FILTER | [2024/11] | French: | FILTRE À PARTICULES | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2023 | Translation filed | 08.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006008396 (WURSTHORN STEPHAN [DE], et al); | [XI]US2007028604 (TWIGG MARTYN V [GB], et al); | [XI]US2016375429 (CHANDLER GUY RICHARD [GB], et al) | International search | [AX]JP2003154223 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [AX]JP2006502842 ; | [A]WO2013145266 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2018537265 ; | [A]JP2021003678 (CATALER CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2019177318 | JP2021100551 |