EP4360909 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNAGA Ietomo Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 02 /
KUWAYAMA Isao Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22828016.0 | 28.03.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022JP15078 | Priority number, date | JP20210102399 | 21.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021102399 | [2024/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022270097 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4360909 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/18, B60C5/00, B60C9/22, B60C11/03 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B60C9/18 (EP,US);
B60C11/03 (EP,US);
B60C11/0304 (EP);
B60C11/033 (EP);
B60C5/00 (EP);
B60C9/22 (EP);
B60C9/2204 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2024/18] | English: | TIRE | [2024/18] | French: | PNEU | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2023 | Translation filed | 21.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5975176 (SCOTT JOHN R [US]); | [A]JP2006151212 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2009061842 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2010120437 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2010120438 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2011102069 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2014172582 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]WO2014162607 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2015202781 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]US2018186189 (PALLOT PATRICK [FR], et al); | [A]JP2019001420 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) | by applicant | JP2014159244 |