EP4361553 - MAGNETIC MARKER DETECTION METHOD AND DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aichi Steel Corporation 1, Wanowari Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 476-8666 / JP | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Michiharu Tokai-shi, Aichi 476-8666 / JP | 02 /
NAGAO, Tomohiko Tokai-shi, Aichi 476-8666 / JP | 03 /
AOYAMA, Hitoshi Tokai-shi, Aichi 476-8666 / JP | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22828425.3 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022JP24756 | Priority number, date | JP20210105652 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021105652 | [2024/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022270509 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361553 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G01B7/00 (EP);
G01B7/003 (EP,KR);
G01D5/14 (US);
B60W40/06 (EP,KR);
G01C21/265 (US);
B60W2420/50 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG MAGNETISCHER MARKER | [2024/18] | English: | MAGNETIC MARKER DETECTION METHOD AND DETECTION SYSTEM | [2024/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE MARQUEUR MAGNÉTIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2024 | Translation filed | 16.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2017108905 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [YX]JP2017194353 (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD); | [X]WO2019198603 (AICHI STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2021100866 (AICHI STEEL CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2005202478 |