EP4360726 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING DART GAME IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenixdarts Co., Ltd. 306, 111 Digital-ro 26-gil (Guro-dong, JNK Digital Tower) Guro-Gu Seoul 08390 / KR | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Sang Uk Seoul 06075 / KR | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22828802.3 | 23.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022KR08982 | Priority number, date | KR20210083418 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210083418 | JP20210155534 | 24.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021155534 | [2024/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022270955 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4360726 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/45, A63F13/49, A63F13/46, A63F13/77, A63F13/798, A63F9/02, A63F13/71, A63F9/24 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
F41J5/00 (EP);
F41J3/02 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/46 (EP);
A63F13/49 (EP);
A63F13/71 (EP);
A63F13/77 (EP);
A63F13/798 (EP);
F41J3/0009 (EP);
F41J3/0028 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES PFEILWURFSPIELBILDES | [2024/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING DART GAME IMAGE | [2024/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION D'IMAGE DE JEU DE FLÉCHETTES | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2024 | Translation filed | 23.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20020007093 (ELLICION INTERNETWORK CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2010220784 (SEGA CORP); | [A]KR20190043111 (HONG INT CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20190079010 (HONG INT CORP [KR]); | [A]KR102113362B ; | [PX]KR102387187B (HONG INT CORP [KR]) | by applicant | KR102136813B |