EP4359077 - DEXMECAMYLAMINE AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atacama Therapeutics, Inc. 65 William Street, Suite 200 Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARON, Joseph, A. Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | 02 /
REIS, Jonathan Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22829402.1 | 24.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022US34932 | Priority number, date | US202163214567P | 24.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163214567 P | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022272083 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359077 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P17/00, A61K31/13, A61K31/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61K31/13 (EP,US);
A61P17/08 (US);
A61P17/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | DEXMECAMYLAMIN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2024/18] | English: | DEXMECAMYLAMINE AND USES THEREOF | [2024/18] | French: | DEXMÉCAMYLAMINE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 29.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013253067 (BENCHERIF MEROUANE [US], et al); | [Y]US2017266132 (BENCHERIF MEROUANE [US]); | [Y]US2020054722 (EDELSON JONATHAN [US]); |