EP4358830 - A NEW DOPING STRATEGY FOR LAYERED OXIDE ELECTRODE MATERIALS USED IN LITHIUM-ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Twelfth Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIN, Huolin Reines Hall Irvine, CA 92697 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Puchberger & Partner Patentanwälte Reichsratsstraße 13 1010 Wien / AT | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22829440.1 | 24.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022US35007 | Priority number, date | US202117358460 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: US202117358460 | US202117508540 | 22.10.2021 Original published format: US202117508540 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022272139 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4358830 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G06N3/02, G16B40/20, G16H50/20, G16H50/70 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H01M4/525 (EP);
C01G53/006 (EP);
C01G53/42 (EP);
C01G53/50 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/70 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2002/76 (EP);
C01P2002/77 (EP);
C01P2002/85 (EP);
C01P2002/88 (EP);
C01P2002/89 (EP);
C01P2004/04 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | NEUE DOTIERUNGSSTRATEGIE FÜR GESCHICHTETE OXIDELEKTRODENMATERIALIEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIEN | [2024/18] | English: | A NEW DOPING STRATEGY FOR LAYERED OXIDE ELECTRODE MATERIALS USED IN LITHIUM-ION BATTERIES | [2024/18] | French: | NOUVELLE STRATÉGIE DE DOPAGE POUR MATÉRIAUX D'ÉLECTRODE D'OXYDE EN COUCHES UTILISÉS DANS DES BATTERIES AU LITHIUM-ION | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 06.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017112427 (SIMON ADAM J [US], et al)[A] 1-30; | [Y]US2019113973 (COLEMAN TREVOR CE [CA], et al) [Y] 16, 29; | [A]WO2020047253 (BLACKTHORN THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-30; | [A]WO2021081418 (ELLIPSIS HEALTH INC [US]) [A] 1-30; | [xyXY] - Syed Arbaaz Qureshi et al, "The Verbal and Non Verbal Signals of Depression -- Combining Acoustics, Text and Visuals for Estimating Depression Level", arXiv.org, Cornell University Library, 201 Olin Library Cornell University Ithaca, NY 14853, 201 Olin Library Cornell University Ithaca, NY 14853 , (20190402), XP081170003 [x] 1-15, 17-28, 30 [y] 16, 29 |