EP4366142 - ELECTRIC MOTOR INVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Valeo Automotive Electrical Systems Co., Ltd. No. 800 Taihua Road Pudong District Shanghai 201201 / CN | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Yubo Shanghai 201201 / CN | 02 /
QIAN, Zheng Shanghai 201201 / CN | 03 /
XU, Jin Shanghai 201201 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jian Shanghai 201201 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Lei Shanghai 201201 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Yangyang Shanghai 201201 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Junhao Shanghai 201201 / CN | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Valeo Powertrain Systems Service Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble le Delta 14, avenue des Béguines 95892 Cergy Pontoise / FR | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22832161.8 | 30.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022CN102656 | Priority number, date | CN202121477518U | 30.06.2021 Original published format: CN 202121477518 U | CN202110734469 | 30.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110734469 | [2024/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023274349 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366142 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/33, H02K9/19 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K9/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR-WECHSELRICHTER | [2024/19] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR INVERTER | [2024/19] | French: | ONDULEUR DE MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2024 | Translation filed | 09.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |