EP4365582 - FLOW CHANNEL CHIP AND SEPARATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCREEN Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-1,Tenjinkita-machi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URAKAWA, Satoshi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | 02 /
SANADA, Masakazu Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | 03 /
OSHIRO, Kyoichi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8307 / JP | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22832939.7 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022JP24757 | Priority number, date | JP20210108620 | 30.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021108620 | [2024/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023276791 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4365582 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/10, C12M1/34, G01N15/00, G01N27/06 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G01N27/026 (EP);
B03C5/005 (EP);
B03C5/026 (EP);
C12M1/34 (EP);
G01N15/147 (EP);
G01N15/1484 (EP);
B03C2201/26 (EP);
G01N15/0266 (EP);
G01N15/0656 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSKANALCHIP UND TRENNSYSTEM | [2024/19] | English: | FLOW CHANNEL CHIP AND SEPARATION SYSTEM | [2024/19] | French: | PUCE DE CANAL D'ÉCOULEMENT ET SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | Translation filed | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]US2003159932 (BETTS WALTER BERNARD [GB], et al); | [A]US2006102482 (AUERSWALD JANKO [CH], et al); | [AX]JP2012071256 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2013215725 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY); | [AX]JP2018194456 (AFI CORP) |