EP4365284 - VIRUS RECOVERY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Medical Co., Ltd. 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAOKA, Rimi Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 02 /
TANIGUCHI, Hiroki Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 03 /
OKADA, Takashi Tokyo 108-0071 / JP | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22833318.3 | 30.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022JP26434 | Priority number, date | JP20210108995 | 30.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021108995 | JP20210109004 | 30.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021109004 | [2024/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023277173 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4365284 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/02, B01D61/00, B01D69/08, C12N1/00, C12N1/02 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N7/00 (US);
B01D63/02 (EP);
B01D71/68 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (US);
C12N1/02 (EP);
B01D2311/04 (EP);
B01D2325/022 (EP);
B01D2325/0283 (EP);
B01D61/145 (EP);
B01D61/16 (EP);
B01D69/02 (EP);
C12N2750/14121 (US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP);
C12N2750/14151 (EP);
C12N2750/14152 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON VIREN | [2024/19] | English: | VIRUS RECOVERY METHOD | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE VIRUS | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2023 | Translation filed | 18.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2004525755 ; | [Y]JP2007295937 (ONCOLYTICS BIOTECH INC); | [Y]WO2010035793 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2018076291 (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD); | [Y]WO2020023612 (VOYAGER THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [Y]JP2020121299 (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2010035793 | JP2018076291 | JP6530171B | WO2020023612 |